SB0359

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Administration (Maryland Meals for Achievement for Teens Act of 2017)

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Veto sustained (0-44)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable Report Adopted31
Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 31
2/27/20172/27/2017Second Reading Passed32
3/1/20173/1/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)34
House3/2/20173/2/2017First Reading Ways and Means37
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (136-0)61
Senate4/3/20173/28/2017Returned Passed57
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/12/20181/12/2018Veto sustained (0-44)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 12, 2018 3:29 P.M.