SB0363 (CH0821)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments {464531/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/24/20173/22/2017Third Reading Passed (31-15)51
House3/24/20173/21/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations55
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (115-22)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 9:16 A.M.