SB0384

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Finance
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2/21/20132/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/22/20132/22/2013Favorable with Amendments {847876/131
Laid Over (Senator Madaleno) Adopted31
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable with Amendments {847876/1 Report Adopted32
Second Reading Passed with Amendments32
2/27/20132/27/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)34
House2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations37
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.