SB0402 (CH0737)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent

Sponsored by:

Senator Zucker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20181/25/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/20181/26/2018Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {604835/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/22/20182/22/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)32
House2/23/20182/23/2018First Reading Ways and Means33
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (118-21)55
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.