SB0485 (CH0322)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Remote Classroom Technology Grant Program - Establishment (Peyton's Bill)

Sponsored by:

Senator Serafini

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/20171/31/2017Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable with Amendments {644538/1 Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/28/20172/28/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)33
House3/1/20173/1/2017First Reading Ways and Means36
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)61
Senate4/3/20173/28/2017Returned Passed57
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:11 P.M.