SB0517 (CH0004)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia

Sponsored by:

Senator Zirkin

Status:

Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/10/20152/10/2015Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/17/20153/17/2015Favorable with Amendments {178278/244
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted44
3/18/20153/18/2015Favorable with Amendments {178278/2 Report Adopted45
Floor Committee Amendment {318871/1 Adopted45
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {973126/1 Rejected (8-38)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/20/20153/20/2015Third Reading Passed (32-13)47
House3/20/20153/18/2015First Reading Judiciary48
3/20/20153/20/2015Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20154/10/2015Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/10/20154/5/2015Favorable Report Adopted66
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {473927/166
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted (86-50)66
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (57-78)66
Second Reading Passed66
4/11/20154/6/2015Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {533827/167
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted67
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (63-73)67
Third Reading Passed (83-53)67
Senate4/13/20154/5/2015Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/22/20155/22/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto overridden (29-17)
House1/21/20161/21/2016Veto overridden (86-55)
Post Passage1/21/20161/21/2016Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.