SB0598

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products

Sponsored by:

Senator Lee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {908075/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
3/1/20183/1/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)37
House3/2/20183/2/2018First Reading Judiciary38
3/13/20183/13/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20184/3/2018Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/7/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)64
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.