SB0604

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Visual Impairments - Requirements for School Personnel Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program Coverage

Sponsored by:

Senator Bates

Status:

In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/2/20172/2/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/20173/8/2017Favorable with Amendments {574830/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations43
3/13/20173/13/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {505560/1 Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed with Amendments67
4/10/20174/4/2017Floor Amendment {193424/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted69
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)69

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:11 P.M.