SB0678

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices

Sponsored by:

Senator Benson

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Finance
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {877776/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (31-13)63
House4/6/20183/28/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations62
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Appropriations
Hearing 4/09 at 3:45 p.m.
Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/9/20184/3/2018Favorable Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
4/9/20184/4/2018Third Reading Passed (90-49)69
Senate12/8/20174/5/2018Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.