SB0706

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Education Credit

Sponsored by:

Senator DeGrange

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20163/14/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable43
Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 43
3/15/20163/15/2016Favorable Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {453921/2 Rejected (17-27)44
Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {523425/1 Rejected (19-26)44
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {543321/1 Rejected (19-26)44
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {303529/1 Rejected (17-29)44
Special Order until later today (Senator Young) Adopted 44
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {143621/1 Rejected (11-30)44
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {273621/1 Rejected (14-31)44
Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {533822/1 Rejected (16-30)44
Second Reading Passed44
3/16/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (25-19)45
House3/17/20163/14/2016First Reading Ways and Means46
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.