SB0751 (CH0678)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles

Sponsored by:

Senator Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20183/9/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/14/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (44-1)46
House3/14/20183/11/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation45
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/9/20184/4/2018Third Reading Passed (132-6)69
Senate12/8/20174/5/2018Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.