SB0944 (CH0453)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Health - Subcutaneous Implanting of Identification Device - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Finance
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20183/28/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/28/20183/24/2018Favorable with Amendments {457676/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
3/29/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)57
House3/30/20183/23/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations57
3/30/20184/2/2018Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
4/2/20184/2/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/9/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (138-1)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.