SB0945 (CH0512)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/25/20163/23/2016Favorable with Amendments {468078/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20163/24/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)53
House3/29/20163/24/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations56
4/4/20164/4/2016Rereferred to Judiciary
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20164/6/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/6/20163/30/2016Favorable with Amendments {952311/2 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (134-2)62
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)62
Senate4/8/20164/2/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments62
Senate Requests House Recede62
Conference Committee Appointed62
Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman62
House4/8/20164/2/2016House Refuses to Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, and Proctor65
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted67
Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
House4/11/20164/9/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted72
Third Reading Passed (141-0)72
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Passed Enrolled72
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.