SJ0005 (JR0001)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Senator Kasemeyer

Status:

Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/6/20172/6/2017Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/9/20172/9/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable20
Special Order until later today (Senator Miller) Adopted 20
Favorable20
Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28)20
Favorable Report Adopted20
Second Reading Passed20
2/10/20172/10/2017Third Reading Passed (29-17)21
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations23
2/13/20172/13/2017Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Favorable Report Adopted24
Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate Healey) Adopted 24
2/14/20172/14/2017Second Reading Passed25
2/15/20172/15/2017Motion vote previous question (Delegate McMillan) Adopted26
Third Reading Passed (89-50)26
Senate2/16/20172/16/2017Returned Passed25
Post Passage2/15/20172/15/2017Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:14 P.M.