HB1440 (CH0146)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts

Sponsored by:

Calvert County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/22/20172/22/2017Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20173/15/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed48
3/18/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)49
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20174/4/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)59
House4/6/20173/30/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.