HB0001

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly, K.

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/4/20129/4/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/2/20131/2/2013Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {432312/1 Report Adopted30
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Vitale) Adopted 30
2/20/20132/20/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) {633626/131
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) Rejected (60-76)31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/22/20132/22/2013Third Reading Passed (132-0)33
Senate2/25/20132/25/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings32
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.