HB0001

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/29/20169/29/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Economic Matters
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/10 at 12:30 p.m.
2/27/20172/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Favorable with Amendments {323090/1 Report Adopted34
Special Order until 3/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 34
3/1/20173/1/2017Floor Amendment {873520/1 (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (53-85)36
Floor Amendment {343529/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-88)36
Floor Amendment {303922/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (52-87)36
Floor Amendment {973927/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (51-88)36
Floor Amendment {143223/1 (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (53-84)36
Floor Amendment {373125/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Rejected (50-86)36
Floor Amendment {543829/1 (Delegate Malone) Rejected (48-89)36
Floor Amendment {103227/1 (Delegate Flanagan)36
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted36
Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-89)36
Floor Amendment {953926/1 (Delegate McMillan) Rejected36
Second Reading Passed with Amendments36
3/3/20173/3/2017Third Reading Passed (88-51)38
Senate3/6/20173/6/2017First Reading Finance37
3/14/20173/14/2017Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {707175/1 Report Adopted56
Floor Amendment {673625/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
4/3/20173/28/2017Floor Committee Amendment {717671/1 Adopted57
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (29-18)57
House4/5/20173/29/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (87-53)63
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2017 11:10 A.M.