HB0008

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits

Sponsored by:

Delegate Vitale

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House11/1/201211/1/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/2/20131/2/2013Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {222518/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.