HB0014

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Part-Time School Employees, Contractors, and Coaches - Sexual Contact with Minors

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/17/20129/17/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/2/20131/2/2013Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {922319/1 Report Adopted51
Special Order until later today (Delegate Olszewski) Adopted 51
Special Order until 3/22 (Delegate Olszewski) Adopted 51
3/23/20133/20/2013Floor Committee Amendment {412711/1 Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {518273/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments67
House Requests Senate Recede67
Conference Committee Appointed67
Delegates Simmons, Mitchell, and Hough67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.