HB0022 (CH0520)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training Oversight

Sponsored by:

Delegate Krimm

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/17/20159/17/2015Pre-filed
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Health and Government Operations
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
1/20/20161/20/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/26 at 12:00 p.m.
1/22/20161/22/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2/16/20162/16/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/17/20162/17/2016Favorable with Amendments {116483/1 Report Adopted26
Second Reading Passed with Amendments26
2/19/20162/19/2016Third Reading Passed (139-0)28
Senate2/22/20162/22/2016First Reading Finance28
3/16/20163/16/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable Report by Finance
3/29/20163/25/2016Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/30/20163/26/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)55
House3/31/20163/26/2016Returned Passed58
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:56 P.M.