HB0027 (CH0430)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barron

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House7/19/20177/19/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/17/20181/17/2018Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/21/20182/21/2018Favorable with Amendments {356180/1 Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/23/20182/23/2018Third Reading Passed (131-0)33
Senate2/26/20182/26/2018First Reading Finance34
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/27/20183/23/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/24/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)55
House3/29/20183/22/2018Returned Passed56
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.