HB0043

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax Credit for Qualifying Employees - Sunset Repeal

Sponsored by:

Delegate Glass

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House10/31/201210/31/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Ways and Means
1/14/20131/14/2013Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m.
4/6/20134/6/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {735264/1 Report Adopted65
Floor Committee Amendment {555866/1 Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)66
Senate4/8/20134/3/2013First Reading Senate Rules65
4/8/20134/8/2013Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/8/20134/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/8/20134/6/2013Third Reading Passed (45-0)68
House4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.