HB0044 (CH0542)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Residential Property - Ground Lease Registration Forms - Contact Information Option

Sponsored by:

Delegate McCray

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House7/5/20167/5/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
1/18/20171/18/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2/13/20172/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2/14/20172/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {610318/1 Report Adopted25
Second Reading Passed with Amendments25
2/16/20172/16/2017Third Reading Passed (131-0)27
Senate2/17/20172/17/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings26
2/22/20172/22/2017Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/1/20173/1/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/7/20174/1/2017Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.