HB0054

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry

Sponsored by:

Delegate Robinson, B.

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House11/13/201211/13/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
1/17/20131/17/2013Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2/19/20132/19/2013Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.