HB0072 (CH0489)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20151/23/2015First Reading Appropriations
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 3/03 at 3:00 p.m.
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/16/20153/13/2015Favorable with Amendments {154463/143A
Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 43A
3/18/20153/15/2015Favorable with Amendments {154463/145A
Committee Amendment (#1-8)45A
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#2) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#3-8) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#9-12) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#13-18) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#19-24) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#25-29)45A
Committee Amendment (#25)45A
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted (90-47)45A
Committee Amendment (#25) Adopted (87-52)45A
Committee Amendment (#26) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#27-29) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#30-35) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#36-43) Adopted45A
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted45A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45A
3/19/20153/17/2015Third Reading Passed (122-17)47
Senate3/20/20153/20/2015First Reading Budget and Taxation47
3/23/20153/23/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/23/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments {429137/147A
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted47A
Motion suspend rule 52 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted47A
3/24/20153/21/2015Favorable with Amendments {429137/148
Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 48
3/25/20153/22/2015Favorable with Amendments {429137/149
Committee Amendment (#1-7) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#8-12) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#13-17) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#18-23) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {813123/1 Rejected49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/26/20153/23/2015Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {583024/1 Rejected (15-31)50
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)50
House3/31/20153/27/2015House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments57
House Requests Senate Recede57
Conference Committee Appointed57
Delegates McIntosh, Jones, Gaines, Hammen, and Haynes57
House advisors:57
(Delegates Proctor, Beitzel, Hixson and B. Barnes)57
Senate4/1/20153/27/2015Senate Refuses to Recede54
Conference Committee Appointed54
Senators Kasemeyer, Madaleno, McFadden, DeGrange, and Edwards54
Senate advisors:54
(Senators Peters, King, Currie and Serafini)54
House4/13/20154/8/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted69
Third Reading Passed (90-49)69
Senate4/13/20154/7/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted65
Third Reading Passed (33-13)65
House4/13/20154/8/2015Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/30/20155/30/2015Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:40 P.M.