HB0074

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder

Sponsored by:

Senator Feldman

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/11/20131/11/2013First Reading Economic Matters
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20133/14/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/18/20133/15/2013Favorable with Amendments {473892/1 Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20133/16/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)49
Senate3/20/20133/18/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs49
4/8/20134/8/2013Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.