HB0083

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/14/20131/14/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (127-6)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation35
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/29/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.