HB0085

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Ways and Means
1/24/20171/24/2017Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/2/20173/2/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/3/20173/3/2017Favorable with Amendments {935564/1 Report Adopted38
Second Reading Passed with Amendments38
3/7/20173/7/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)40
Senate3/9/20173/9/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation40
3/15/20173/15/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {669632/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/5/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (136-0)70
Passed Enrolled70

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 11, 2017 2:35 P.M.