HB0086 (CH0205)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native Language

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20161/18/2016First Reading Ways and Means
1/20/20161/20/2016Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2/22/20162/22/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
2/23/20162/23/2016Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/25/20162/25/2016Third Reading Passed (125-13)32
Senate2/26/20162/26/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs32
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20163/30/2016Favorable with Amendments {894230/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/6/20163/31/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)60
House4/7/20164/1/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (132-5)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:57 P.M.