HB0088

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens

Sponsored by:

Delegate Arora

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/14/20131/14/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {210217/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {668173/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)60
House4/4/20133/30/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (137-0)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.