HB0102 (CH0425)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/16/20131/16/2013First Reading Appropriations
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Favorable with Amendments {154869/144
Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Conway) Adopted 44
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable with Amendments {154869/146
Committee Amendment (#1-5)46
Committee Amendment (#1-2) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#3) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#4-5) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#6-9)46
Committee Amendment (#6) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#7) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#8) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#9) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#10-14) Adopted46
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {753122/1 Adopted46
Floor Amendment (Delegate James) {103227/1 Adopted46
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {833225/1 Rejected (44-89)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/15/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (101-36)48
Senate3/15/20133/15/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation46
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/18/20133/16/2013Favorable with Amendments {879732/147
3/19/20133/16/2013Motion suspend rule 52(c)(1) (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted47
3/18/20133/16/2013Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted47
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {879732/148
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 48
3/20/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {879732/149
Committee Amendment (#1-4) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#5-7) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#8-11) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Floor Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) {269832/1 Adopted (#12)49
Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) {233523/1 Rejected49
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {603426/1 Adopted (#13)49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted (47-0)49
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5)49
House3/22/20133/19/2013House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments52
Conference Committee Appointed52
Delegates Conway, Bohanan, Griffith, Guzzone, and Eckardt52
House advisors:52
(Delegates Proctor, Jones, Haynes and Hixson)52
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013Senate Refuses to Recede52
Conference Committee Appointed52
Senators Kasemeyer, Jones-Rodwell, DeGrange, Madaleno, and Brinkley52
Senate advisors:52
(Senators McFadden, Robey, Edwards and Peters)52
House4/4/20133/30/2013Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Conway) Adopted 63
4/5/20133/31/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (103-36)64
Senate4/5/20134/1/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted63
Third Reading Passed (39-6)63
House4/5/20133/31/2013Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.