HB0104 (CH0474)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Medical Cannabis - Written Certifications - Certifying Providers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20161/18/2016First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/21/20161/21/2016Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2/23/20162/23/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/24/20162/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {286680/1 Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/26/20162/26/2016Third Reading Passed (110-21)33
Senate2/29/20162/29/2016First Reading Finance33
3/2/20163/2/2016Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings and Finance35
3/7/20163/7/2016Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable Report Adopted (35-11)63
Second Reading Passed63
4/11/20164/4/2016Special Order until later today (Senator Hough) Adopted 64
4/11/20164/5/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {443028/1 Rejected (17-29)65
Third Reading Passed (36-10)65
House4/11/20164/7/2016Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:57 P.M.