HB0116 (CH0039)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud

Sponsored by:

Delegate Mitchell

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/16/20131/16/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2/11/20132/11/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/12/20132/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted25
Second Reading Passed25
2/14/20132/14/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)27
Senate2/15/20132/15/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings26
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.