HB0116

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras

Sponsored by:

Delegate Conaway

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/9/20141/9/2014First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20143/13/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/13/20143/10/2014Favorable with Amendments {792311/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/14/20143/11/2014Third Reading Passed (102-35)47
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings47
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20144/3/2014Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 2, 2014 5:52 P.M.