HB0129

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/17/20131/17/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (103-28)53A
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.