HB0141

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Assessments - Limits on Testing

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/20/20161/20/2016First Reading Ways and Means
1/27/20161/27/2016Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {495869/1 Report Adopted46
Special Order until next session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 46
3/19/20163/17/2016Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (138-0)50
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:58 P.M.