HB0150 (CH0150)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2018)

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 150


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20171/18/2017First Reading Appropriations
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/13/20173/10/2017Favorable with Amendments44
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 44
3/15/20173/12/2017Favorable with Amendments46
Committee Amendment (#1-14) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#15-27) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#28-38)46
Committee Amendment (#28-32) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#33) Adopted (89-51)46
Committee Amendment (#34-38) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#39-50)46
Committee Amendment (#39-48) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#49) Adopted (86-55)46
Committee Amendment (#50) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#51-63) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#64-80) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#81-92) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#93-110)46
Committee Amendment (#93-103) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#104-110) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#111-124)46
Committee Amendment (#111-115) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#116) Adopted (90-50)46
Committee Amendment (#117-122) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#123) Adopted (84-53)46
Committee Amendment (#124) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#125-130) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#131-162) Adopted46
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment {943425/1 (Delegate Reilly) Rejected (54-82)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20173/13/2017Third Reading Passed (135-6)47
Senate3/17/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/20/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments46A
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted46A
3/21/20173/19/2017Favorable with Amendments48
Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 48
3/22/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments49
Committee Amendment (#1-15) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#16-27) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#28-38) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#39-50) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#51-63) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#64-72) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#73) Adopted (33-14)49
Committee Amendment (#74-76) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Floor Committee Amendment {399938/1 Adopted49
Floor Amendment {263722/1 (Senator Kagan) Rejected (11-36)49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/23/20173/21/2017Floor Amendment {103827/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted50
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)50
House3/24/20173/21/2017House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments55
House Requests Senate Recede55
Conference Committee Appointed55
Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Beitzel55
House advisors:55
(Delegates Haynes, B. Barnes and A. Miller)55
Senate3/24/20173/22/2017Senate Refuses to Recede51
Conference Committee Appointed51
Senators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, King, and Edwards51
Senate advisors:51
(Senators McFadden, Ferguson and Serafini)51
House3/28/20173/23/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted57
Third Reading Passed (133-7)57
Senate3/28/20173/24/2017Motion Special Order until evening session (Senator Salling) Rejected (19-26)53
Conference Committee Report Adopted (46-1)53
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/18/20173/28/2017Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution
4/18/20174/18/2017Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 150

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.