HB0151 (CH0022)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, and 2016

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20171/18/2017First Reading Appropriations
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments48
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 48
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments49
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#2-5) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#6-13) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#14-38) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#39-70) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (120-12)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46A
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments50
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#2-6) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#7) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#8) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#9) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#10-17) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#19-25) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#18) Adopted (28-15)50
Committee Amendment (#26) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#27) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#28) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#29-30) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#32-37) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#39-42) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#44) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#31, 38, 43) Adopted (31-16)50
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/24/20173/22/2017Floor Amendment {763423/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (14-33)51
Floor Amendment {403428/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (15-31)51
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)51
House3/27/20173/22/2017House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments56
House Requests Senate Recede56
Conference Committee Appointed56
Delegates Jones, A. Miller, McIntosh, Gaines, and Ghrist56
House advisors:56
(Delegates Reznik and Haynes)56
Senate3/27/20173/23/2017Senate Refuses to Recede52
Conference Committee Appointed52
Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, Peters, Currie, and Edwards52
Senate advisors:52
(Senators Madaleno, Eckardt and King)52
House3/29/20173/25/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted59
Third Reading Passed (123-13)59
Senate3/29/20173/25/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted54
Third Reading Passed (46-0)54
House3/29/20173/25/2017Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/6/20174/6/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.