HB0152 (CH0023)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20171/18/2017First Reading Appropriations
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/13/20173/10/2017Favorable with Amendments {954468/144
Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 44
3/15/20173/12/2017Committee Amendment (#1-7) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#8-12) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#13-18) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#19-24)46
Committee Amendment (#19-21) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#22) Adopted (89-51)46
Committee Amendment (#23-24) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#25-28) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#29) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#30-32)46
Committee Amendment (#30) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#31) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#32) Adopted46
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment {273929/1 (Delegate McMillan) Rejected (48-88)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20173/13/2017Third Reading Passed (112-29)47
Senate3/17/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/20/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments {129234/146A
Motion to Suspend Rule 52 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted46A
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted46A
3/21/20173/19/2017Favorable with Amendments {129234/148
Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 48
3/22/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments {129234/149
Committee Amendment (#1-4) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#5-9) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#10-13) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#14-17) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#18-22) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/23/20173/21/2017Floor Amendment {243720/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33)50
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-6)50
House3/24/20173/21/2017House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments55
House Requests Senate Recede55
Conference Committee Appointed55
Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Beitzel55
House advisors:55
(Delegates Haynes, B. Barnes and A. Miller)55
Senate3/24/20173/22/2017Senate Refuses to Recede51
Conference Committee Appointed51
Senators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, King, and Edwards51
Senate advisors:51
(Senators McFadden, Ferguson and Serafini)51
House3/28/20173/23/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted57
Third Reading Passed (115-25)57
Senate3/28/20173/24/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted53
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/6/20174/6/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.