HB0156

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Theft of Wheeled Cart - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Delegate Reznik

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/17/20131/17/2013Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {852016/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.