HB0172 (CH0035)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County Board of Education and School Board Nominating Commission

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 35


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20161/21/2016First Reading Ways and Means
1/27/20161/27/2016Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing cancelled
2/18/20162/18/2016Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments {495467/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/18/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (90-49)48
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {174937/153
Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Astle) Adopted 53
3/29/20163/25/2016Favorable with Amendments {174937/154
Special Order until later today (Senator Reilly) Adopted 54
Favorable with Amendments {174937/154
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted54
3/30/20163/26/2016Favorable with Amendments {174937/155
Committee Amendment Withdrawn55
Favorable Report Adopted55
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {413620/1 Rejected (13-31)55
Second Reading Passed55
3/31/20163/27/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {913422/1 Rejected (15-31)56
Third Reading Passed (32-14)56
House3/31/20163/26/2016Returned Passed58A
Post Passage4/5/20164/5/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House4/7/20164/7/2016Veto overridden (90-50)63
Senate4/8/20164/2/2016Veto overridden (31-15)62
Post Passage4/8/20164/5/2016Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 35

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:58 P.M.