HB0180 (CH0062)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative Defense

Sponsored by:

Delegate Glenn

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {492717/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (92-40)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.