HB0183 (CH0779)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Prince George's County Environmental Justice Commission PG 411-18

Sponsored by:

Prince George's County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
3/13/20183/13/2018Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/4/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018First Reading Senate Rules62
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:18 P.M.