HB0197

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points

Sponsored by:

Delegate Anderson

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
1/29/20131/29/2013Hearing cancelled
1/30/20131/30/2013Reassigned to Judiciary16
1/31/20131/31/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {492514/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (107-28)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings35

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.