HB0197

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - State Reimbursement for County Board Payments for Exams for Eligible Students

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {975468/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (135-2)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation48B
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 22, 2018 2:46 P.M.