HB0221 (CH0081)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Local Government – School Construction – Permits

Sponsored by:

Delegate Bromwell

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Appropriations
1/26/20181/26/2018Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {784469/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
3/1/20183/1/2018Third Reading Passed (134-0)37
Senate3/2/20183/2/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation38
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 1:01 P.M.