HB0224 (CH0158)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Election Law - Improving Access to Voting

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {765560/1 Report Adopted50
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {523829/1 Rejected (52-76)50
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {563722/1 Rejected (40-93)50
Floor Committee Amendment {965669/1 Adopted50
Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 50
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {483128/1 Rejected (44-93)50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (92-43)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {454231/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-11)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (99-40)67
Passed Enrolled67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.