HB0225 (CH0155)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {126789/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {464438/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (139-0)67
Passed Enrolled67
Post Passage4/17/20134/17/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.