HB0229 (CH0004)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable Income

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable Report Adopted42
Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted 42
3/8/20133/8/2013Second Reading Passed43
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation44
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/29/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:05 P.M.