HB0235 (CH0361)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Property Tax - Valuation of Residential Real Property - Database

Sponsored by:

Delegate McComas

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {525569/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation52
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.